CA SB543 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 424, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 424, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1049 of, and to repeal and add Sections 1047 and 1048 of, the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Veterans: Veterans' Home of California.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB543 Wolk Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 543 Wolk Senate Third Reading By IRWIN (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB543 Wolk (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 543 Wolk Senate Third Reading By IRWIN (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB543 Wolk (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 424, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 5324.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 5888.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (August 3). |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | June 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 1205.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1156.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 826.) (April 28). |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | April 14 hearing postponed by committee. Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 1010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 1047 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 1048 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 1049 | Amended Code | Citation Text |