CA SB542 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on October 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 390, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on October 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 390, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 3212.15 of the Labor Code, relating to workers’ compensation.
Title
Workers’ compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB542 Stern et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 542 Stern Senate Third Reading By Irwin (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB542 Stern (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 542 Stern Senate Third Reading By Irwin (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB542 Stern (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 390, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2852.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3322.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2019-08-28 | Assembly | August 28 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | (Received at desk July 17 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)). |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 3. Page 1189.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1102.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 654.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 3212.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |