CA SB542 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 831, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 831, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2786, 5006, 5006.1, and 5007 of the Penal Code, relating to the Inmate Welfare Fund, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Inmate Welfare Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB542 Price Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-29 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Assembly - SB 542 Price Senate Third Reading By MITCHELL (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Public Safety (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB542 Price (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-29 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Assembly - SB 542 Price Senate Third Reading By MITCHELL (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Public Safety (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB542 Price (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 831, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m. | |
2012-08-30 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5015.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-29 | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4988.) | |
2012-08-27 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 4858.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-08-24 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-23 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6190.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-21 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-16 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 16). | |
2012-08-08 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-06-27 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-26 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 19). | |
2012-06-12 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-05-30 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-03-01 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-07-05 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-27 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-06-23 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-06-20 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-06-13 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 1243.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-18 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-17 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1014.) (May 16). | |
2011-05-10 | Set for hearing May 16. | |
2011-05-05 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-04 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 848.) (May 2). | |
2011-04-14 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2011-04-12 | Set for hearing May 2. | |
2011-04-11 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-04-04 | Set for hearing April 25. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 5000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5015.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5076 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 5076.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6530 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6582.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 2786 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 5006 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 5006.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 5007 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 5012 | New Code | See Bill Text |