CA SB54 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 75, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 75, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 41821.5 of, to add Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 42040) to Part 3 of Division 30 of, and to repeal Section 42064 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Solid waste: reporting, packaging, and plastic food service ware.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB54 Allen et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - SB 54 Allen Senate Third Reading By RIVAS, L (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB54 Allen et al (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - SB 54 Allen Senate Third Reading By RIVAS, L (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB54 Allen et al (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 75, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-06-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-06-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:10 a.m. | |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 4572.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 2. Page 5628.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2022-06-26 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-06-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 2800.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | From inactive file on motion of Senator Allen. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Allen. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 917.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | April 12 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-12-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 41821.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42040 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 42064 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |