CA SB534 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 491, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 491, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1902.3, 1917.1, 1926.1, 1926.3, 1941, 1950.5, and 1951 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Dental hygienists.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-03 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB534 Jones Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 534 Jones Senate Third Reading By Chen (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB534 Jones (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 534 Jones Senate Third Reading By Chen (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB534 Jones (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 491, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2380.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2719.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-06-30 | Assembly | June 30 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1037.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 840.) (April 19). |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 670.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 1902.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 1917.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 1926.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 1926.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 1941 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 1950.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 1951 | Amended Code | Citation Text |