CA SB534 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 249, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 10.2 (commencing with Section 927) to Chapter 1 of Part 2 of Division 1 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurers: minority, women, LGBT, veteran, and disabled veteran business enterprises.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-26 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB534 Bradford Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Assembly - SB 534 Bradford Senate Third Reading By Daly (Y: 61 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB534 Bradford (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-05 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 249, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-05 Approved by the Governor.
2019-08-30SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2019-08-26SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2267.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-08-22SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-08-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 4. Page 2809.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-08-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (August 14).
2019-07-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-03AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2019-06-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2019-06-13AssemblyRe-referred to Coms. on JUD. and INS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Coms. on INS. and JUD.
2019-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 1. Page 1366.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-28SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-24SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-05-24SenateRead third time and amended.
2019-05-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 1033.) (May 13).
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 799.) (April 23).
2019-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2019-04-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 652.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-03-28SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2019-03-28SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Coms. on INS. and JUD.
2019-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2019-02-21SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance Code927New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback