CA SB533 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-07 - Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-07 - Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25200 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverages: beer labels.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-13 - Senate - Special Consent #4 SB533 Knight (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-07 | Assembly | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 907.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 639.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 25200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 25202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 25202.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |