CA SB532 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 557, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 557, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8558 of the Government Code, relating to emergency services.
Title
Emergency services: state of emergency: cyberterrorism.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB532 Dodd Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 532 Dodd Senate Third Reading By AGUIAR-CURRY (Y: 79 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB532 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 532 Dodd Senate Third Reading By AGUIAR-CURRY (Y: 79 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB532 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 557, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6115.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 1. Page 6979.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | From consent calendar. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4116.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Set for hearing January 16. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4005.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Set for hearing January 9. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | March 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 2089.26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 8558 | Amended Code | Citation Text |