CA SB531 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 455, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 455, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1788.14.5 to the Civil Code, relating to consumer debt.
Title
Consumer debt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-01 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB531 Wieckowski Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Assembly - SB 531 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By Gallagher (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB531 Wieckowski (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Assembly - SB 531 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By Gallagher (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB531 Wieckowski (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 455, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2280.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 1. Page 2570.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (August 19). |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 6). |
2021-06-29 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 19. Page 2124.) |
2021-06-25 | Assembly | June 28 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | June 14 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1087.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 936.) (April 27). |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 702.) (April 7). |
2021-03-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1788.14.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |