CA SB531 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 53084.5 of the Government Code, relating to local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local agencies: retailers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-05 - Assembly - SB 531 Glazer Senate Third Reading By Quirk (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - SB 531 Glazer Senate Third Reading By Quirk (Y: 36 N: 21 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB531 Glazer et al (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13 Veto sustained.
2020-01-13 Stricken from file.
2019-10-12 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2019-10-12 Vetoed by the Governor.
2019-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 9 a.m.
2019-09-05SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 21. Page 3034.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-05AssemblyReconsideration granted.
2019-08-30AssemblyMotion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Quirk.
2019-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 36. Noes 21. Page 2912.)
2019-07-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-07-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 8).
2019-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2019-06-03AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and REV. & TAX.
2019-05-16AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-16SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 1056.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-29SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 846.) (April 24).
2019-04-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-04-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-03-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2019-02-21SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code53084.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback