CA SB529 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-29 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 20. Noes 15. Page 1368.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-29 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 20. Noes 15. Page 1368.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 2.9 (commencing with Section 1954.700) to Title 5 of Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, relating to tenancy.
Title
Tenant associations: eviction for cause.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB529 Durazo (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB529 Durazo Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB529 Durazo (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB529 Durazo Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB529 Durazo (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 20. Noes 15. Page 1368.) |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1340.) |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Motion to reconsider made by Senator Durazo. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 15. Page 1340.) |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1102.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 799.) (April 23). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1954.700 | New Code | See Bill Text |