CA SB529 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to transportation, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Transportation funding: Downtown/Riverfront Streetcar
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 99152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |