CA SB527 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 533, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 533, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 10 (commencing with Section 33430) to Chapter 3 of Part 20 of Division 2 of Title 2 of, and to repeal Section 33434 of, the Education Code, relating to education finance.
Title
Education finance: Safe Neighborhoods and Schools Fund:
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Liu [D] | Asm. Tony Thurmond [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB527 Liu Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-26 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 527 Liu Senate Third Reading By THURMOND (Y: 63 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB527 Liu (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-26 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 527 Liu Senate Third Reading By THURMOND (Y: 63 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB527 Liu (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 533, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2016-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5570.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-26 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 5456.) |
2016-08-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5448.) Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 15. Page 5916.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 11). |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | June 29 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-01-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 2953.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2934.) (January 21). |
2016-01-16 | Senate | Set for hearing January 21. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 814.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | April 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 33430 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 33434 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 33480 | New Code | See Bill Text |