CA SB526 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19006 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Personal income taxes: joint returns: court orders: relief from liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-18 - Senate - Special Consent SB526 Fuller (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - SB 526 Fuller Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB526 Fuller (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - SB 526 Fuller Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB526 Fuller (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2016-09-29 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2016-09-29 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5140.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5778.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2016-01-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-01-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 11). |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Removed from REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2016-01-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2015-07-13 | Assembly | July 13 set for first hearing. Placed on REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1245.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1155.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 816.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18533 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19006 | Amended Code | Citation Text |