CA SB526 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Intercity rail: San Joaquin Corridor: Altamont Pass

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-01 Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2009-05-28 Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
2009-05-22 Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
2009-05-11 Placed on APPR suspense file.
2009-05-01 Set for hearing May 11.
2009-04-29 From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 708.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-04-21 Set for hearing April 28.
2009-04-13 Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2009-04-02 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2009-03-12 To Com. on RLS.
2009-03-02 Read first time.
2009-02-28 From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
2009-02-27 Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback