CA SB525 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 241, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 20026, 20042, 20138, 20636, 20636.1, 21261, 21337, 21409, 21424, 21454, 21459, 21462, 21473, 21475.5, 21476.5, 21477, 21481, 75071, 75071.5, 75571, and 75571.5 of, to add Section 20309.7 to, and to repeal Section 21228 of, the Government Code, relating to public employees’ retirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public employees’ retirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-24 - Assembly - SB 525 Pan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB525 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 241, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-11 Approved by the Governor.
2017-08-30SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-08-24SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-08-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2769.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-07-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-07-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19).
2017-07-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
2017-05-16AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-15SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1073.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-05-08SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateMay 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2017-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 529.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-17SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2017-02-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
2017-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code20026Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20042Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20138Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20309.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code20636Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20636.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code21228Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code21261Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code21337Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code21409Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code21424Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code21454Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code21459Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code21462Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code21473Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code21475.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code21476.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code21477Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code21481Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code75071Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code75071.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code75571Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code75571.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback