CA SB524 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1367.44 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10123.66 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care coverage: patient steering.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-03 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB524 Skinner et al. Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 524 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Arambula (Y: 57 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB524 Skinner (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-08SenateIn Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2021-10-08SenateVetoed by the Governor.
2021-09-09 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
2021-09-03SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2378.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-09-02SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-09-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 7. Page 2734.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-08-31AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-30AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (August 26).
2021-08-19AssemblyAugust 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2021-07-07AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (July 6).
2021-06-28AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2021-06-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2021-06-14AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-05-28AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P.
2021-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-05-24SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1232.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1195.) (May 20).
2021-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-17SenateMay 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-05-07SenateSet for hearing May 17.
2021-05-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 956.) (April 28).
2021-04-19SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-04-15SenateSet for hearing April 28.
2021-04-13SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-04-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 670.) (April 5).
2021-03-16SenateSet for hearing April 5.
2021-03-15SenateMarch 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-03-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2021-03-11SenateSet for hearing March 22.
2021-02-25SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-18SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
2021-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1367.44New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code10123.66New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback