CA SB524 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-12 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-12 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 454.58 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Energy efficiency programs: workforce requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB524 Stern (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB524 Stern (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (August 30). |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | (Received at desk July 17 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)). |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | June 26 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 1030.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2. Page 524.) (April 2). |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 454.58 | New Code | See Bill Text |