CA SB524 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 98.73 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment: violations: good faith defense.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Vidak [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - Senate - [Second] hearing set for [04-26-2017]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 1 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 1 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | April 26 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 2. Page 854.) Reconsideration granted. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | March 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 98.73 | New Code | See Bill Text |