CA SB523 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 630, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 630, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12920, 12921, 12926, 12931, 12940, 12944, and 12993 of, and to add Sections 22853.3 and 22853.4 to, the Government Code, to amend Sections 1343 and 1367.25 of, and to add Sections 1367.255 and 1367.33 to, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 10123.196 of, and to add Sections 10123.1945 and 10127.09 to, the Insurance Code, and to add Sections 10509.5 and 10828 to the Public Contract Code, relating to reproductive health.
Title
Contraceptive Equity Act of 2022.
Sponsors
Sen. Connie Leyva [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D] |
Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB523 Leyva et al. Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - SB 523 Leyva Senate Third Reading By Cristina Garcia (Y: 62 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB523 Leyva et al (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - SB 523 Leyva Senate Third Reading By Cristina Garcia (Y: 62 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB523 Leyva et al (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 630, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5377.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 5347.) |
2022-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 5264.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2022-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (August 11). |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | August 26 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (July 6). |
2021-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on L. & E. and HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and L. & E. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 1332.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1195.) (May 20). |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 955.) (April 28). |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | April 21 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 671.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and HEALTH. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH, L., P.E. & R., and JUD. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12920 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12921 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12926 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12931 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12940 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12944 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12993 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 22853.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 22853.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1343 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1367.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1367.255 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1367.33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.1945 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.196 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10127.09 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 10509.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 10828 | New Code | See Bill Text |