CA SB520 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-21 - August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 30 @ 9:00 am Assembly Appropriations Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 216 of, and to add Article 13 (commencing with Section 397) to, and to repeal the heading of Article 13 (commencing with former Section 397) of, Chapter 2.3 of Part 1 of Division 1 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electrical service: provider of last resort.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB520 Hertzberg (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-21AssemblyAugust 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-08-13AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-08-12Assembly(Received at desk July 17 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)).
2019-08-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 10).
2019-06-27AssemblyJuly 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2019-06-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on U. & E.
2019-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1187.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1102.) (May 16).
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-05-01SenateMay 6 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-04-30SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2019-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 842.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2019-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-04-03SenateApril 10 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-03-26SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2019-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2019-02-21SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code1Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code13Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code2.3Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code216Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code397New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback