CA SB520 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Part 1.5 (commencing with Section 2600) to Division 1 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electricity: intervenor funding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB520 Mitchell (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-01AssemblySeptember 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-19AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (July 12).
2017-06-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on U. & E.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 1382.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenatePublished May 26 at 9 p.m.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1186.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-04-17SenateApril 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2017-04-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 621.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-09SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2017-02-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
2017-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code2600New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback