CA SB519 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 444, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 444, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 104.26 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to state highways.
Title
State highways: property leases.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Steven Bradford [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 519 Beall Senate Third Reading By GIPSON (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB519 Beall et al. Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 519 Beall Senate Third Reading Amend By GIPSON Set #1 (Y: 58 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB519 Beall (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB519 Beall et al. Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 519 Beall Senate Third Reading Amend By GIPSON Set #1 (Y: 58 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB519 Beall (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 444, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 6168.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 6200.) |
2018-08-31 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6112.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2018-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (August 29). |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 6470.) |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4068.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4019.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Set for hearing January 10. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | April 19 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19 in EQ. pending receipt. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | April 5 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and EQ. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 104.26 | New Code | See Bill Text |