CA SB519 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 472, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 3051.1 to the Penal Code, relating to parole.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Youth offender parole hearings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB519 Hancock Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 519 Hancock Senate Third Reading By JONES-SAWYER (Y: 64 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB519 Hancock (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-03 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 472, Statutes of 2015.
2015-10-03 Approved by the Governor.
2015-09-15SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 a.m.
2015-09-10SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2667.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2015-09-08SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2015-09-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 14. Page 2954.) Ordered to the Senate.
2015-09-04AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-19AssemblyAugust 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2015-07-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-07-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14).
2015-06-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2015-06-04AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2015-06-03SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1303.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2015-06-02SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2015-06-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1155.) (May 28).
2015-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 28.
2015-05-11SenateMay 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2015-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 11.
2015-04-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 823.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-16SenateSet for hearing April 28.
2015-04-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2015-03-12SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2015-02-27SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
2015-02-26SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_519&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0501-0550/sb_519_bill_20150226_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0501-0550/sb_519_bill_20150406_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0501-0550/sb_519_bill_20150602_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0501-0550/sb_519_bill_20150716_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0501-0550/sb_519_bill_20150904_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0501-0550/sb_519_bill_20150910_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0501-0550/sb_519_bill_20151003_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0501-0550/sb_519_vote_20150428_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0501-0550/sb_519_vote_20150511_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0501-0550/sb_519_vote_20150528_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0501-0550/sb_519_vote_20150603_0608PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0501-0550/sb_519_vote_20150714_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0501-0550/sb_519_vote_20150827_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0501-0550/sb_519_vote_20150908_0114PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0501-0550/sb_519_vote_20150910_1151AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback