CA SB519 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 188, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 21572, 21573, and 21574.7 of, and to add Section 22944.3 to, the Government Code, relating to public employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public employment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB519 Ashburn Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-10 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-09 - Assembly - SB 519 Ashburn Senate Third Reading By HERNANDEZ (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB519 Ashburn (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-10-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 188, Statutes of 2009.
2009-10-11 Approved by Governor.
2009-09-28 Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
2009-09-11 Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2418.) To enrollment.
2009-09-10 In Senate. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10 be re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2391.) Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2399.)
2009-09-09 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 2. Page 3205.) To Senate.
2009-09-04 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-09-03 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on September 3.)
2009-09-02 Read third time. Amended. (Page 2924.) Re-referred to Com. On P.E.,R. & S.S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2949.)
2009-08-31 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) (Received by Desk on August 28 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(11).) Read second time. To third reading.
2009-08-19 Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2009-07-08 From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 8.)
2009-06-25 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Hearing postponed by committee.
2009-06-15 To Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
2009-06-01 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2009-06-01 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1099.) To Assembly.
2009-05-28 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1072.) Read second time. To third reading.
2009-05-22 Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
2009-05-04 Placed on APPR suspense file.
2009-04-24 Set for hearing May 4.
2009-04-20 From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 557.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-04-14 Set for hearing April 20.
2009-04-13 Hearing postponed by committee.
2009-04-03 Set for hearing April 13.
2009-03-12 To Com. on P.E. & R.
2009-02-27 From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
2009-02-26 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_519&sess=0910&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0501-0550/sb_519_bill_20090226_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0501-0550/sb_519_bill_20090625_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0501-0550/sb_519_bill_20090902_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0501-0550/sb_519_bill_20090915_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0501-0550/sb_519_bill_20091011_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0501-0550/sb_519_vote_20090504_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0501-0550/sb_519_vote_20090528_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0501-0550/sb_519_vote_20090601_0135PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0501-0550/sb_519_vote_20090708_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0501-0550/sb_519_vote_20090827_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0501-0550/sb_519_vote_20090903_000004_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0501-0550/sb_519_vote_20090909_0442PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0501-0550/sb_519_vote_20090910_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0501-0550/sb_519_vote_20090911_0507PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback