CA SB518 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 702, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 702, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 32251 of, and to add Section 32457.1 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Tax: winegrower returns and schedules.
Sponsors
Sen. John Laird [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-18 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB518 Laird et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-17 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-15 - Assembly - SB 518 Laird Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB518 Laird (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-17 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-15 - Assembly - SB 518 Laird Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB518 Laird (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 702, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-26 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2022-08-18 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4898.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-17 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4884.) |
2022-08-16 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4835.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-08-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2022-08-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5885.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2022-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 2734.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | From inactive file on motion of Senator Laird. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Laird. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1194.) (May 20). |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | May 10 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 936.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 857.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 32251 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 32457.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |