CA SB518 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 7149.06 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to fishing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sport fishing licenses: 12 consecutive month licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB518 De León et al (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2018-05-10AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 10). Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2018-05-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-04-04AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-09-15AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-06-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 1313.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenatePublished May 26 at 10 a.m.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1186.) (May 25).
2017-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-16SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2017-05-16SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-05SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 727.) (April 18).
2017-04-05SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2017-03-23SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2017-03-20SenateApril 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-09SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2017-02-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
2017-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback