CA SB518 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 7149.06 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to fishing.
Title
Sport fishing licenses: 12 consecutive month licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB518 De León et al (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do passtle="No Votes Recorded">No Votes Recorded: (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB518 De León et al (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do passtle="No Votes Recorded">No Votes Recorded: (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | June 27 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 10). Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 1313.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 26 at 10 a.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1186.) (May 25). |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 727.) (April 18). |
2017-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | April 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 7149.06 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26205.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 26211 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26213 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26214 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26215 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26216 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26217 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26227 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26227.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 26233 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26240 | Amended Code | Citation Text |