CA SB517 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 61, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 61, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1203.2, 3000.08, 3056, and 3455 of the Penal Code, relating to supervised persons.
Title
Supervised persons: release.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Assembly - SB 517 Monning Senate Third Reading By QUIRK (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB517 Monning (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB517 Monning (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 61, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-07-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2147.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 16). |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 668.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 595.) (April 14). |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1203.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 3000.08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 3056 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 3455 | Amended Code | Citation Text |