CA SB517 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 636, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 636, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19601.01 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to horse racing, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Horse racing: thoroughbred associations or fairs: wager
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Florez [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-10-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB517 Florez (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB517 Florez Reconsider (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB517 Florez Concurrence (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-09-08 - Assembly - SB 517 Florez Third Reading Urgency By COTO (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB517 Florez Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB517 Florez Reconsider (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB517 Florez Concurrence (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-09-08 - Assembly - SB 517 Florez Third Reading Urgency By COTO (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB517 Florez Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 636, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-23 | Approved by Governor. | |
2009-10-15 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2009-10-14 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2517.) To enrollment. | |
2009-09-10 | Senate refuses to concur in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 24. Noes 2. Page 2393.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Florez. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2393.) | |
2009-09-09 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2009-09-08 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3065.) To Senate. | |
2009-09-03 | Read third time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2009-09-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-31 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2009-08-19 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-07-09 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 8.) | |
2009-06-08 | To Com. on G.O. | |
2009-06-01 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-06-01 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 1095.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-27 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-05-20 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2009-05-18 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-14 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 849.) | |
2009-05-11 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2009-05-04 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2009-04-23 | Set for hearing May 12. | |
2009-04-22 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-03-27 | Set for hearing April 28. | |
2009-03-12 | To Com. on G.O. | |
2009-02-27 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |