CA SB514 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 280 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to broadband services.
Title
California Teleconnect Fund Administrative Committee Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | May 15 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 727.) (April 18). |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | April 4 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | March 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Set for hearing March 21. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 280 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 884 | Amended Code | Citation Text |