CA SB512 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-05 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-05 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 12.5 (commencing with Section 9800) to Division 8.5 of, and to repeal Section 9805 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to long-term services and supports.
Title
Long-term services and supports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB512 Pan et al (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB512 Pan et al (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and HUM. S. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 1202.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1101.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 1. Page 772.) (April 23). |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 621.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and G.O. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 9800 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 9805 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |