CA SB512 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 428, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 428, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 684 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Health care practitioners: stem cell therapy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Senate - Special Consent SB512 Hernandez et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Assembly - SB 512 Hernandez Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB512 Hernandez et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Assembly - SB 512 Hernandez Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB512 Hernandez et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 428, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-21 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2903.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2539.) |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Set for hearing September 6. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2017-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2854.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23). |
2017-08-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 11). |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 990.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 974.) (May 3). |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 684 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1744 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |