CA SB51 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 494.7 to the Business and Professions Code, and to add Section 12812.7 to the Government Code, relating to government data.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professional licensees: environmental sciences and climate change: whistleblower and data protection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-06 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB51 Jackson Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Assembly - SB 51 Jackson Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, C (Y: 59 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB51 Jackson (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-13 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2017-10-13 Vetoed by the Governor.
2017-09-11SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-09-06SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 2504.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-05SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-09-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 13. Page 2970.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-08-31AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 30).
2017-07-12AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (July 11).
2017-07-03AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-06-12AssemblyReferred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 1253.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1177.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-05SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 851.) (April 25).
2017-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2017-04-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 622.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-03-30SenateSet for hearing April 5.
2017-03-28SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2017-03-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 488.) (March 27).
2017-03-14SenateSet for hearing March 27.
2017-03-08SenateRe-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D., EQ., and JUD.
2017-02-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-15SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-15SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-01-12SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2016-12-06SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
2016-12-05SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code494.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code12812.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback