CA SB51 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2014 - 25% progression
Action: 2015-01-15 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]


An act to amend Section 22150 of the Financial Code, relating to financial institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


California Finance Lenders Law.



2015-01-15SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2015-01-05SenateRead first time.
2014-12-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 21.
2014-12-19SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Financial Code22150Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

Bill Comments