CA SB506 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 4121 and 21083.06 to the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Environmental Quality Act: Greenhouse Gas Reduction Fund monies: greenhouse gas emissions: vegetation management projects.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-03-12SenateMarch 16 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-03-01SenateSet for hearing March 16.
2021-02-25SenateReferred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-18SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
2021-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code21083.06New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code4121New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback