CA SB505 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 3343.8 to the Civil Code, and to add Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 11627.5) to Chapter 1 of Part 3 of Division 2 of the Insurance Code, relating to civil law.
Title
Civil law: firearms liability and insurance.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Sen. Josh Becker [D] | Sen. Steven Bradford [D] |
Asm. Matt Haney [D] | Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Sen. Dave Min [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB505 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB505 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 28). |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1061.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 860.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 671.) (April 5). |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 3343.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 11627.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |