CA SB505 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Set for hearing April 2.
Pending: Senate Elections and Constitutional Amendments Committee
Hearing: Apr 2 @ 9:30 am in Room 112
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 6041, 6101, 6122, 6340, 6360, 6382, 6520, 6581, 6591, 6721, 6722, 6781, 6791, 6851.5, 6852, and 6854.5 of, to amend and renumber Sections 6000a and 6001 of, and to add Sections 6000.1, 6000.2, and 6857.2 to, the Elections Code, relating to elections, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Presidential primary elections.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13SenateSet for hearing April 2.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2019-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2019-02-21SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code6000.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code6000.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code6041Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code6101Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code6122Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code6340Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code6360Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code6382Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code6520Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code6581Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code6591Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code6721Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code6722Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code6781Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code6791Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code6851.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code6852Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code6854.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code6857.2New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback