CA SB504 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 14, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 14, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2150 and 2170 of, to repeal Sections 3022 and 13315 of, and to repeal and add Section 2212 of, the Elections Code, relating to elections, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Elections: voter registration.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Becker [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB504 Becker Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Assembly - SB 504 Becker Third Reading Urgency By Bryan (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Assembly - SB 504 Becker Third Reading Urgency By Bryan (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Assembly - SB 504 Becker Senate Third Reading By Mayes (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB504 Becker (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Assembly - SB 504 Becker Third Reading Urgency By Bryan (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Assembly - SB 504 Becker Third Reading Urgency By Bryan (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Assembly - SB 504 Becker Senate Third Reading By Mayes (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB504 Becker (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 14, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-03-31 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-03-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:45 a.m. | |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3280.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Urgency clause adopted. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3251.) |
2022-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3233.) Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2022-03-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 4047.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | Set for hearing March 29 in E. & C.A. pending receipt. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-03-17 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, urgency clause adopted, and passed to the Senate. | |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 0. Page 3527.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-01-14 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-14 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Megan Dahle. |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Mayes. |
2021-09-09 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. | |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2609.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ELECTIONS and PUB. S. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1414.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | From special consent calendar on motion of Senator Becker. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1194.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 861.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 499.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Set for hearing March 15. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A., PUB. S., and JUD. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 13315 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2150 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2212 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 3022 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |