CA SB503 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-13 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 14452 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medi-Cal: managed care plan: subcontracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB503 Pan Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 503 Pan Senate Third Reading By Wood (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB503 Pan (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-13 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2019-10-13 Vetoed by the Governor.
2019-09-17SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2019-09-10SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2786.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-10SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-09-09SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3189.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-08-14AssemblyAugust 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-18AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-06-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1211.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1101.) (May 16).
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 848.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-02SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-03-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2019-02-21SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14304Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14452Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback