CA SB501 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 929, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1601.4 and 2827 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 1682, 1724, and 1750.5 of, to add Sections 1601.8, 1646.10, 1647.9.5, and 1647.17.5 to, to add Article 2.75 (commencing with Section 1646), Article 2.84 (commencing with Section 1647), and Article 2.87 (commencing with Section 1647.30) to Chapter 4 of Division 2 of, to add and repeal Section 1601.7 of, and to repeal Article 2.7 (commencing with Section 1646), Article 2.85 (commencing with Section 1647.10), and Article 2.8 (commencing with Section 1647) of Chapter 4 of Division 2 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to dentistry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dentistry: anesthesia and sedation: report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB501 Glazer Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 501 Glazer Senate Third Reading By LOW (Y: 77 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB501 Glazer (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 929, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-29 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-06SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-30SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6058.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-30SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-08-29SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 2. Page 6763.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2017-09-01AssemblySeptember 1 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-09-01AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2017-08-30AssemblyAugust 30 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1272.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1186.) (May 25).
2017-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-16SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2017-05-11SenateMay 15 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-01SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 825.) (April 24).
2017-04-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-03-31SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2017-03-30SenateApril 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-28SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-02-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
2017-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code1601.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1601.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code1616.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code1646Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1646.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1646.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1646.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1646.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1646.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1646.6.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code1646.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1646.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1647Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1647.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1647.10Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1647.18Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1647.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1647.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1647.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1647.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1647.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1647.8.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code1682New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code1724New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code1750.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code2827Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback