CA SB501 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-23 - From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on INS. and TRANS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on INS.
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-23 - From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on INS. and TRANS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on INS.
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12804.9 of the Vehicle Code, relating to drivers' licenses.
Title
Drivers' licenses: examinations: driving tests: proof of financial responsibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Insurance (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB501 Corbett (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB501 Corbett (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on INS. and TRANS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2013-06-25 | Assembly | Heard for testimony only. |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and JUD. |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 773.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 663.) (April 23). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 60 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 12804.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |