CA SB500 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 1 (commencing with Section 885) to Chapter 4 of Division 4 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans: education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB500 Morrell et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-30AssemblyAugust 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2019-08-21AssemblyAugust 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 18).
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on V.A.
2019-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1283.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-05-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1101.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-04-29SenateApril 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 29.
2019-04-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 625.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-04SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
2019-03-26SenateSet for hearing April 9.
2019-03-20SenateMarch 26 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-03-19SenateSet for hearing March 26.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Com. on V.A.
2019-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2019-02-21SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Military and Veterans Code885New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback