CA SB500 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 518, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 518, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 518, 520, 523, 524, and 526 of the Penal Code, relating to extortion.
Title
Extortion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB500 Leyva et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - SB 500 Leyva Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, C (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB500 Leyva et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - SB 500 Leyva Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, C (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB500 Leyva et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 518, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-22 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2995.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3404.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | July 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1329.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 26 at 10 a.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1185.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 599.) (April 4). |
2017-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 267.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 518 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 520 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 523 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 524 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 526 | Amended Code | Citation Text |