CA SB50 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-27 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-27 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8207, 8208, and 8263 of, to add Sections 8213.5 and 8213.6 to, and to add and repeal Section 8207.5 of, the Education Code, and to amend Section 10271 of, and to add Sections 10271.7 and 10271.8 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to early learning and care.
Title
Early learning and care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB50 Limón et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 50 Limón Senate Third Reading By McCarty (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB50 Limón et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 50 Limón Senate Third Reading By McCarty (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB50 Limón et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-27 | Senate | Veto sustained. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Stricken from file. |
2021-10-06 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2552.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2910.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 7). |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and ED. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1317.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1181.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 685.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 604.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing March 24. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S. |
2020-12-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 8207 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8207.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8208 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8213.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 8213.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 8263 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10271 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10271.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10271.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |