CA SB498 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 688, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 688, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6213 and 6214 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to attorneys.
Title
Funds for the provision of legal services to indigent persons: disabled veterans.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Umberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-08-30 - Senate - Special Consent SB498 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Assembly - SB 498 Umberg Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB498 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Military & Veterans Affairs] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Assembly - SB 498 Umberg Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB498 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Military & Veterans Affairs] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 688, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-03 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2241.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-08-17 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2373.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 6). |
2021-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2021-06-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | June 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and M. & V.A. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 886.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 796.) (April 14). |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 591.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and M. & V.A. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 6213 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6214 | Amended Code | Citation Text |