CA SB497 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 546, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 546, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17325 of the Family Code, to amend Sections 1339.1 and 2701 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, and to amend Section 11006.2 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to direct deposit of funds.
Title
Qualifying accounts for direct deposit of publicly administered funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB497 Limón et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - SB 497 Limón Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB497 Limón et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - SB 497 Limón Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB497 Limón et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 546, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-03 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2214.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2523.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2021-08-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 19. Page 2124.) |
2021-06-25 | Assembly | June 28 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and HUM. S. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1316.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1194.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 857.) (April 20). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 702.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and HUMAN S. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 17325 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 1339.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 2701 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11006.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |