CA SB497 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 38597 of, and to add Section 38575 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.
Title
California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006: fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-01 - Senate - Set, second hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 6. Page 789.) Reconsideration granted. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 38575 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 38597 | Amended Code | Citation Text |