CA SB495 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 551, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 551, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3011, 3020, and 3040 of the Family Code, relating to child custody.
Title
Child custody.
Sponsors
Sen. Maria Durazo [D] | Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Sen. Susan Eggman [D] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] |
Asm. Todd Gloria [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-03 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB495 Durazo et al. Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Assembly - SB 495 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Mark Stone (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB495 Durazo et al (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Assembly - SB 495 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Mark Stone (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB495 Durazo et al (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 551, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2436.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 2845.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-19 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 4). |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 592.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 553.) (April 2). |
2019-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 3011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 3020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 3040 | Amended Code | Citation Text |