CA SB495 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 224, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 2081 and 5050 of, and to add Section 2081.12 to, the Fish and Game Code, relating to protected species, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protected species: blunt-nosed leopard lizard: taking or possession.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB495 Vidak et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-07 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-05 - Assembly - SB 495 Vidak Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB495 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 224, Statutes of 2018.
2018-08-27 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-15SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-09SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5224.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-07SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 5202.)
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5170.) Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-08-06SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2018-07-05SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-07-05AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6110.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-07-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-06-28AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-12AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-06-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2018-04-23AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2018-04-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-04-09AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2017-05-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2017-04-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-04-20SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 769.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-04-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2017-03-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-09SenateSet for hearing March 28.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2017-02-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
2017-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code19601.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Fish and Game Code2081Amended CodeCitation Text
Fish and Game Code2081.12New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code5050Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback